U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00116-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Brownstein
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2019
  • February 05, 2019: [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
  • February 01, 2019: [Status Report]
January, 2019
  • January 16, 2019: [Judgment Returned Executed]
December, 2018
  • December 20, 2018: [Judgment]
  • December 20, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • December 19, 2018: [Addendum]
  • December 16, 2018: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • December 11, 2018: [Order]
  • December 10, 2018: [Sentencing Memorandum]
September, 2018
  • September 14, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 14, 2018: [In Chambers Conference]
  • September 06, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
August, 2018
  • August 20, 2018: [Trial Notice]
  • August 20, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 10, 2018: [Stipulation to Detention and/or Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • August 10, 2018: [Initial Appearance/Arraignment]
  • August 10, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • August 10, 2018: [Appoint Counsel]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: [Hearing Notice]
  • July 27, 2018: [Praecipe for Warrant]
  • July 27, 2018: [Warrant Issued]
  • July 27, 2018: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.