U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00118-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hernandez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2019
  • December 13, 2019: [Receipt of Exhibits]
  • December 10, 2019: [Return of Exhibits]
August, 2019
  • August 15, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • August 14, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • August 08, 2019: [Order on Motion to Clarify]
  • August 07, 2019: [Clarify]
  • August 05, 2019: [Telephone Conference]
July, 2019
  • July 09, 2019: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
June, 2019
  • June 21, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • May 31, 2019: [Continue Trial]
  • May 21, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • May 17, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • May 17, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • April 24, 2019: [Continue Trial]
March, 2019
  • March 14, 2019: [Rescheduling Motion Hearing Notice]
  • March 13, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • March 11, 2019: [Terminate Deadlines PUBLIC]
  • March 08, 2019: [Witness List]
  • March 01, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • March 01, 2019: [Continue Trial]
February, 2019
  • February 06, 2019: [Motion Hearing Notice]
  • February 05, 2019: [Objection to Motion]
January, 2019
  • January 22, 2019: [Suppress]
December, 2018
  • December 17, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • December 07, 2018: [Clerk's Notice - Filing Due]
November, 2018
  • November 26, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • November 21, 2018: [Continue Trial]
  • November 14, 2018: [Trial Reminder]
September, 2018
  • September 04, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
August, 2018
  • August 24, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • August 23, 2018: [Continue Trial]
  • August 06, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 06, 2018: [Trial Notice]
  • August 06, 2018: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 06, 2018: [Initial Appearance/Arraignment]
  • August 02, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 01, 2018: [Rescheduling Hearing Notice]
July, 2018
  • July 30, 2018: [Hearing Notice]
  • July 27, 2018: [Warrant Issued]
  • July 27, 2018: [Praecipe for Warrant]
  • July 27, 2018: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.