U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00119-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gosselin
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 02, 2022: [Request to Dismiss Probation Petition]
February, 2022
  • February 07, 2022: [Continue]
January, 2022
  • January 21, 2022: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 20, 2022: [Order]
  • January 03, 2022: [Continue]
December, 2021
  • December 16, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 10, 2021: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • December 09, 2021: [Petition on Probation/SR/Bail - Order - Summons/Public Warrant]
  • December 09, 2021: [Order]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Consent to Video/Telephonic Conference Waiver to Appear in Person]
  • November 18, 2021: [Continue]
  • November 18, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • November 08, 2021: [Petition on Probation/SR/Bail - Order - Summons/Public Warrant]
May, 2021
  • May 20, 2021: [Judgment - Revocation]
  • May 19, 2021: [Acknowledgment of Sentencing Options]
  • May 19, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
April, 2021
  • April 08, 2021: [Continue]
February, 2021
  • February 16, 2021: [Continue]
January, 2021
  • January 04, 2021: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 04, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
December, 2020
  • December 30, 2020: [Amend]
  • December 21, 2020: [Order on Motion for Bail]
  • December 21, 2020: [Continue]
  • December 21, 2020: [Bail]
  • December 10, 2020: [Continue]
November, 2020
  • November 19, 2020: [Continue]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Detention Order]
  • October 26, 2020: [Stipulation to Detention and/or Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • October 21, 2020: [Continue]
  • October 19, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 15, 2020: [Miscellaneous Filing]
  • October 15, 2020: [Order]
  • October 14, 2020: [Arrest]
July, 2020
  • July 30, 2020: [Continue]
  • July 21, 2020: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • July 21, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • July 21, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • July 13, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
June, 2020
  • June 29, 2020: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • June 25, 2020: [Continue]
  • June 24, 2020: [Summons Issued]
  • June 24, 2020: [Petition on Probation/SR/Bail - Order - Summons/Public Warrant]
June, 2019
  • June 26, 2019: [Judgment]
  • June 25, 2019: [Acknowledgment of Sentencing Options]
  • June 10, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • June 03, 2019: [In Chambers Conference]
  • June 03, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • June 03, 2019: [Sentencing Letter/Impact Statement - Public]
  • June 03, 2019: [Exhibit]
May, 2019
  • May 24, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum]
March, 2019
  • March 28, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 26, 2019: [Continue]
January, 2019
  • January 24, 2019: [Substitute Attorney]
  • January 16, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 14, 2019: [Rescheduling Hearing Notice]
  • January 10, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 03, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
December, 2018
  • December 27, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • December 22, 2018: [Continue Trial]
  • December 19, 2018: [Trial Reminder]
November, 2018
  • November 16, 2018: [ECF - Filing Error - Action Required]
  • November 16, 2018: [Sentencing Memorandum]
October, 2018
  • October 23, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • October 12, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • October 11, 2018: [Continue Trial]
August, 2018
  • August 21, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • August 10, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • August 10, 2018: [Continue Trial]
  • August 07, 2018: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • August 03, 2018: [Trial Notice]
  • August 03, 2018: [Order]
  • August 03, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • August 02, 2018: [Waiver of Presence at Arraignment]
  • August 02, 2018: [Appoint Counsel]
  • August 01, 2018: [Terminate Deadlines PUBLIC]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: [Hearing Notice]
  • July 30, 2018: [Praecipe for Warrant]
  • July 30, 2018: [Warrant Issued]
  • July 30, 2018: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.