U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00121-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Palladino
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 01, 2021: [Satisfaction of Judgment]
June, 2020
  • June 29, 2020: [Terminate Motions PUBLIC]
  • June 29, 2020: [Terminate Deadlines PUBLIC]
  • June 29, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • June 25, 2020: [Withdraw Document]
  • June 22, 2020: [Motion Hearing Notice]
  • June 19, 2020: [Objection to Motion]
  • June 19, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend Time to Object/Respond]
  • June 17, 2020: [Extend Time to Object/Respond]
  • June 10, 2020: [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
  • June 10, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • June 09, 2020: [Compassionate Release]
  • June 09, 2020: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
February, 2019
  • February 08, 2019: [Judgment]
  • February 08, 2019: [Special Hearing]
  • February 05, 2019: [Rescheduling Hearing Notice]
January, 2019
  • January 03, 2019: [Acknowledgment of Sentencing Options]
  • January 02, 2019: [Sentencing]
December, 2018
  • December 26, 2018: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • December 21, 2018: [Sentencing Memorandum]
November, 2018
  • November 15, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 15, 2018: [Continue]
August, 2018
  • August 22, 2018: [Hearing Notice]
  • August 22, 2018: [Waiver of Indictment/Plea Hearing]
  • August 22, 2018: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 22, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 22, 2018: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • August 16, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • August 16, 2018: [Appoint Counsel]
  • August 06, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 31, 2018: [Summons Issued]
  • July 31, 2018: [Praecipe for Summons]
  • July 31, 2018: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.