U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00111-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rondeau
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2019
  • March 01, 2019: [Judgment - Amended]
February, 2019
  • February 15, 2019: [Judgment]
  • February 14, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • February 14, 2019: [Acknowledgment of Sentencing Options]
  • February 13, 2019: [Rescheduling Hearing Notice]
  • February 06, 2019: [Order]
  • February 05, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • February 04, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum]
November, 2018
  • November 06, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 01, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
October, 2018
  • October 15, 2018: [Trial Reminder]
September, 2018
  • September 18, 2018: [Trial Notice]
August, 2018
  • August 29, 2018: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 29, 2018: [Initial Appearance/Arraignment]
  • August 29, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • August 29, 2018: [Appoint Counsel]
  • August 28, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 28, 2018: [Hearing Notice]
  • August 28, 2018: [Arrest]
  • August 03, 2018: [Substitute Attorney]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.