U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00122-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Khanna
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2019
  • February 12, 2019: [Transcript]
January, 2019
  • January 15, 2019: [Judgment]
  • January 14, 2019: [Acknowledgment of Sentencing Options]
  • January 14, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • January 03, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • January 02, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • January 02, 2019: [Order on Sealed Motion]
December, 2018
  • December 30, 2018: [Sealed Motion - Court Use]
  • December 29, 2018: [Sealed Document]
September, 2018
  • September 27, 2018: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 27, 2018: [Waiver of Indictment/Plea Hearing]
  • September 27, 2018: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • September 27, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
August, 2018
  • August 16, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 14, 2018: [Continue]
  • August 03, 2018: [Hearing Notice]
  • August 03, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 03, 2018: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.