U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00115-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Mendoza et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 22, 2021: [Order on Probation 12BOrder]
  • June 21, 2021: [Recusal Order]
  • June 17, 2021: [Request to Dismiss Probation Petition]
  • June 17, 2021: [Reset Hearings PUBLIC]
April, 2021
  • April 28, 2021: [Case Reassigned]
  • April 06, 2021: [Continue]
February, 2021
  • February 04, 2021: [Continue]
January, 2021
  • January 08, 2021: [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
  • January 08, 2021: [Stipulation to Detention and/or Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • January 07, 2021: [Order]
December, 2020
  • December 16, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • December 16, 2020: [Summons Returned Unexecuted]
  • December 15, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 11, 2020: [Petition on Probation/SR/Bail - Order - Summons/Public Warrant]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • November 30, 2020: [Order]
  • November 25, 2020: [Substitute Attorney]
  • November 23, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • November 09, 2020: [Summons Issued]
  • November 09, 2020: [Petition on Probation/SR/Bail - Order - Summons/Public Warrant]
July, 2019
  • July 16, 2019: [Transcript]
May, 2019
  • May 13, 2019: [CJA 20 Payment Information]
April, 2019
  • April 17, 2019: [Judgment]
  • April 15, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 15, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • April 01, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 01, 2019: [Miscellaneous Filing]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: [Judgment]
  • March 27, 2019: [Acknowledgment of Sentencing Options]
  • March 27, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • March 14, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • March 12, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 06, 2019: [Continue]
February, 2019
  • February 27, 2019: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • February 22, 2019: [Motion Referred]
  • February 21, 2019: [Modify Conditions of Release]
December, 2018
  • December 21, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 14, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 14, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 11, 2018: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • December 06, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • December 03, 2018: [Information - Felony]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • November 29, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 29, 2018: [Continue Trial]
  • November 27, 2018: [Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases]
  • November 20, 2018: [ECF - Filing Error - Info Only]
  • November 20, 2018: [(RETIRED) Consolidate Cases]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • September 13, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • September 12, 2018: [Continue Trial]
  • September 05, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • September 05, 2018: [Setting Conditions of Release]
August, 2018
  • August 31, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 30, 2018: [Organizational Victim]
  • August 29, 2018: [Rescheduling Hearing Notice]
  • August 28, 2018: [Trial Notice]
  • August 27, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 27, 2018: [Detention Order - Temporary]
  • August 27, 2018: [Stipulation to Detention and/or Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • August 27, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • August 27, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • August 27, 2018: [Appoint Counsel]
  • August 23, 2018: [Hearing Notice]
  • August 09, 2018: [Indictment - Superseding]
  • August 06, 2018: [Case Unsealed]
  • August 06, 2018: [Arrest - Other District]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.