U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00123-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Macias-Monjes
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: [Judgment]
  • October 31, 2018: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • October 30, 2018: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • October 30, 2018: [Combined Change of Plea and Sentencing - Re-entry After Deportation]
  • October 02, 2018: [Substitute Attorney]
September, 2018
  • September 17, 2018: [Rescheduling Hearing Notice]
August, 2018
  • August 09, 2018: [Hearing Notice]
  • August 09, 2018: [Acknowledgment and Waiver of Rights]
  • August 08, 2018: [Expedited Plea /Sentencing Hearing - Re-entry After Deporation]
  • August 08, 2018: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.