U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00126-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Herrera-Fuentes
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2020
  • October 13, 2020: [Judgment]
November, 2019
  • November 20, 2019: [Transcript]
October, 2019
  • October 08, 2019: [Transcript]
September, 2019
  • September 04, 2019: [Appellate Case Number]
  • September 03, 2019: [Clerks Certificate/Appeal Record Sent to USCA]
  • September 03, 2019: [Appeal Cover Sheet]
  • September 03, 2019: [Notice of Appeal]
August, 2019
  • August 23, 2019: [Judgment]
  • August 07, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
June, 2019
  • June 07, 2019: [Objection - not to motion]
May, 2019
  • May 24, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • May 20, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • May 14, 2019: [Extend Time]
  • May 08, 2019: [Transcript]
  • May 02, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • May 02, 2019: [In Chambers Conference]
April, 2019
  • April 10, 2019: [Objection to Motion]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • March 18, 2019: [Notice - Other]
January, 2019
  • January 24, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 24, 2019: [Miscellaneous Filing]
  • January 11, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
December, 2018
  • December 27, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • December 19, 2018: [Clerk's Notice - Filing Due]
  • December 17, 2018: [Transcript]
  • December 03, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: [Continue Trial]
  • November 30, 2018: [In Limine]
  • November 29, 2018: [Assent to Motion]
  • November 29, 2018: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • November 28, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • November 27, 2018: [In Limine]
  • November 27, 2018: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • November 27, 2018: [Witness List]
  • November 26, 2018: [Juror Questionnaires]
  • November 20, 2018: [Final Pretrial Order]
  • November 19, 2018: [Final Pretrial Conference]
  • November 19, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • November 19, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 14, 2018: [Dismiss]
  • November 13, 2018: [Rescheduling Hearing Notice]
  • November 07, 2018: [Motion Hearing Notice]
  • November 05, 2018: [Objection to Motion]
October, 2018
  • October 23, 2018: [Dismiss]
  • October 02, 2018: [Substitute Attorney]
September, 2018
  • September 26, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • September 25, 2018: [Clerk's Notice-Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • September 13, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • September 12, 2018: [Continue Trial]
August, 2018
  • August 17, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 17, 2018: [Trial Notice]
  • August 16, 2018: [Stipulation to Detention and/or Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • August 16, 2018: [Initial Appearance/Arraignment]
  • August 16, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • August 16, 2018: [Appoint Counsel]
  • August 09, 2018: [Hearing Notice]
  • August 09, 2018: [Warrant Issued]
  • August 09, 2018: [Praecipe for Warrant]
  • August 09, 2018: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.