U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00125-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Peres-Ovando
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2019
  • January 16, 2019: [Judgment]
  • January 14, 2019: [Acknowledgment and Waiver of Rights]
  • January 14, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • January 02, 2019: [Order]
December, 2018
  • December 30, 2018: [Sentencing Memorandum]
October, 2018
  • October 02, 2018: [Substitute Attorney]
  • October 01, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 01, 2018: [Rescheduling Hearing Notice]
September, 2018
  • September 24, 2018: [Terminate Deadlines PUBLIC]
  • September 24, 2018: [Acknowledgment and Waiver of Rights]
August, 2018
  • August 20, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 17, 2018: [Trial Notice]
  • August 16, 2018: [Stipulation to Detention and/or Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • August 16, 2018: [Initial Appearance/Arraignment]
  • August 16, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • August 16, 2018: [Appoint Counsel]
  • August 09, 2018: [Hearing Notice]
  • August 09, 2018: [Warrant Issued]
  • August 09, 2018: [Praecipe for Warrant]
  • August 09, 2018: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.