U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00128-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Mendoza et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2019
  • April 16, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 15, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • April 09, 2019: [Clerk's Notice - Filing Due]
March, 2019
  • March 27, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 27, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • March 25, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • March 25, 2019: [Continue Trial]
  • March 21, 2019: [Terminate Deadlines PUBLIC]
February, 2019
  • February 20, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • February 19, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • February 14, 2019: [Continue Trial]
  • February 01, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
January, 2019
  • January 23, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • January 22, 2019: [Continue Trial]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • November 29, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • November 29, 2018: [Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases]
  • November 28, 2018: [Case Reassigned]
  • November 28, 2018: [Recusal Order]
  • November 20, 2018: [Continue Trial]
  • November 20, 2018: [ECF - Filing Error - Info Only]
  • November 20, 2018: [(RETIRED) Consolidate Cases]
  • November 20, 2018: [Miscellaneous Filing]
  • November 20, 2018: [Trial Reminder]
October, 2018
  • October 11, 2018: [Petition on Probation/SR/Bail - Order - Summons/Public Warrant]
  • October 04, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • September 21, 2018: [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
  • September 20, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • September 14, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • September 14, 2018: [Order]
  • September 12, 2018: [Continue Trial]
  • September 07, 2018: [Organizational Victim]
August, 2018
  • August 27, 2018: [Trial Notice]
  • August 27, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 27, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • August 27, 2018: [Stipulation to Detention and/or Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • August 27, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • August 27, 2018: [Appoint Counsel]
  • August 23, 2018: [Hearing Notice]
  • August 10, 2018: [Trial Notice]
  • August 10, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 10, 2018: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 10, 2018: [Initial Appearance/Arraignment]
  • August 10, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • August 10, 2018: [Appoint Counsel]
  • August 09, 2018: [Hearing Notice]
  • August 09, 2018: [Warrant Issued]
  • August 09, 2018: [Praecipe for Warrant]
  • August 09, 2018: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.