U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00127-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Khawaja
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 17, 2021: [Response - not to motion]
  • March 16, 2021: [Modify Conditions of Release]
September, 2020
  • September 16, 2020: [Judgment - Amended]
  • September 16, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 15, 2020: [Miscellaneous Filing]
  • September 14, 2020: [Telephone Conference]
August, 2020
  • August 06, 2020: [Memorandum]
  • August 04, 2020: [Memorandum]
July, 2020
  • July 22, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 22, 2020: [Memorandum]
  • July 22, 2020: [Order]
  • July 21, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • July 20, 2020: [Rescheduling Motion Hearing Notice]
  • July 20, 2020: [Order]
  • July 20, 2020: [Seal Document-Court Use]
  • July 20, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • July 19, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 09, 2020: [Continue]
June, 2020
  • June 24, 2020: [Continue]
  • June 18, 2020: [Motion Hearing Notice]
  • June 17, 2020: [Objection to Motion]
  • June 12, 2020: [ECF - Filing Error - Info Only]
  • June 12, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2020
  • April 22, 2020: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
  • April 14, 2020: [Objection to Motion]
  • April 13, 2020: [Miscellaneous Filing]
  • April 10, 2020: [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
  • April 10, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • April 09, 2020: [Exhibit]
  • April 09, 2020: [Compassionate Release]
January, 2020
  • January 08, 2020: [Judgment]
  • January 03, 2020: [Acknowledgment of Sentencing Options]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • October 30, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • October 25, 2019: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • October 25, 2019: [Objection to Motion]
  • October 25, 2019: [Sealed Motion - Court Use]
  • October 25, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • October 22, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • October 22, 2019: [Extend Time]
September, 2019
  • September 25, 2019: [Continue]
August, 2019
  • August 16, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 14, 2019: [Continue]
May, 2019
  • May 02, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 02, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
April, 2019
  • April 26, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • April 16, 2019: [Continue Trial]
  • April 11, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • April 01, 2019: [Rescheduling Hearing Notice]
  • April 01, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: [Continue Trial]
January, 2019
  • January 07, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • January 06, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • January 02, 2019: [Continue Trial]
December, 2018
  • December 28, 2018: [Trial Reminder]
November, 2018
  • November 08, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
September, 2018
  • September 17, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • September 11, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • September 07, 2018: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • September 06, 2018: [Continue Trial]
August, 2018
  • August 22, 2018: [Trial Notice]
  • August 21, 2018: [Waiver of Presence at Arraignment]
  • August 13, 2018: [Hearing Notice]
  • August 10, 2018: [Warrant Issued]
  • August 10, 2018: [Praecipe for Warrant]
  • August 10, 2018: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.