U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00124-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bosari
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2020
  • June 09, 2020: [CJA 20 Payment Information]
March, 2020
  • March 17, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • March 16, 2020: [Extend Time]
  • March 10, 2020: [Collateral Returned]
February, 2020
  • February 24, 2020: [Collateral Returned]
  • February 21, 2020: [Judgment]
  • February 21, 2020: [Acknowledgment of Sentencing Options]
  • February 21, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • February 19, 2020: [ECF - Filing Error - Info Only]
  • February 18, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • February 10, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
October, 2019
  • October 24, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 24, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 03, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • September 27, 2019: [Continue Trial]
  • September 23, 2019: [Juror Questionnaires]
August, 2019
  • August 07, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • August 01, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: [Continue Trial]
  • July 29, 2019: [Juror Questionnaires]
  • July 10, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • July 01, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Continue Trial]
  • June 07, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • June 03, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • June 01, 2019: [Continue Trial]
April, 2019
  • April 04, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
March, 2019
  • March 22, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • March 20, 2019: [Continue Trial]
February, 2019
  • February 08, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
January, 2019
  • January 30, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • January 29, 2019: [Continue Trial]
  • January 03, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • January 03, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • January 02, 2019: [Continue Trial]
  • January 02, 2019: [Juror Questionnaires]
December, 2018
  • December 11, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • November 27, 2018: [Continue Trial]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • September 14, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • September 13, 2018: [Continue Trial]
  • September 05, 2018: [Notice - Other]
  • September 05, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
August, 2018
  • August 29, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 15, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 13, 2018: [Collateral Receipt]
  • August 13, 2018: [Trial Notice]
  • August 10, 2018: [Initial Appearance/Arraignment]
  • August 10, 2018: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 10, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • August 10, 2018: [Appoint Counsel]
  • August 10, 2018: [Hearing Notice]
  • August 10, 2018: [Case Unsealed]
  • August 10, 2018: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.