U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00129-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Almand
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 08, 2021: [Judgment - Amended]
February, 2019
  • February 26, 2019: [Transcript]
  • February 12, 2019: [Judgment Returned Executed]
  • February 11, 2019: [Forfeiture Order]
  • February 11, 2019: [Forfeiture]
January, 2019
  • January 08, 2019: [Judgment]
  • January 04, 2019: [Acknowledgment of Sentencing Options]
  • January 04, 2019: [Sentencing]
December, 2018
  • December 21, 2018: [Sentencing Memorandum]
October, 2018
  • October 12, 2018: [Forfeiture Order]
  • October 12, 2018: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • October 10, 2018: [Forfeiture]
September, 2018
  • September 20, 2018: [Waiver of Indictment/Plea Hearing]
  • September 20, 2018: [Waiver of Indictment]
August, 2018
  • August 16, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 15, 2018: [Continue]
  • August 13, 2018: [Hearing Notice]
  • August 13, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 13, 2018: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.