U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cr-00010-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Pena
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2021
  • January 05, 2021: [Judgment Returned Executed]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Judgment]
  • August 06, 2020: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • August 06, 2020: [Acknowledgment of Sentencing Options]
  • August 02, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 02, 2020: [Strike]
July, 2020
  • July 13, 2020: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
  • July 08, 2020: [Unseal Document]
May, 2020
  • May 05, 2020: [Continue]
March, 2020
  • March 17, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
January, 2020
  • January 28, 2020: [Substitute Attorney]
  • January 23, 2020: [Transcript]
September, 2019
  • September 16, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • September 06, 2019: [Rescheduling Hearing Notice]
August, 2019
  • August 02, 2019: [Continue]
July, 2019
  • July 29, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 24, 2019: [Miscellaneous Filing]
  • July 24, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • July 16, 2019: [Continue]
  • July 12, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum]
April, 2019
  • April 01, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 01, 2019: [In Chambers Conference]
March, 2019
  • March 26, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • February 22, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • February 19, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • February 19, 2019: [Order]
  • February 15, 2019: [Continue]
  • February 15, 2019: [Trial Reminder]
January, 2019
  • January 02, 2019: [Order]
  • January 02, 2019: [Substitute Attorney]
December, 2018
  • December 28, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • December 21, 2018: [Telephone Conference]
  • December 21, 2018: [Hearing Notice]
October, 2018
  • October 11, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • October 02, 2018: [Clerk's Notice-Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • October 01, 2018: [Notice - Mail Returned]
September, 2018
  • September 14, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • September 13, 2018: [Order]
  • September 13, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • September 13, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 13, 2018: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 12, 2018: [Continue Trial]
  • September 12, 2018: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
August, 2018
  • August 21, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 21, 2018: [Trial Notice]
  • August 21, 2018: [Stipulation to Detention and/or Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • August 21, 2018: [Initial Appearance/Arraignment]
  • August 20, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 17, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 17, 2018: [Continue]
  • August 16, 2018: [Case Unsealed]
  • August 16, 2018: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.