U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00134-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Loaiza
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 21, 2022: [Judgment - Revocation]
  • July 20, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • July 20, 2022: [Acknowledgment of Sentencing Options]
  • July 14, 2022: [Miscellaneous Filing]
  • July 11, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 08, 2022: [Stipulation to Detention and/or Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
May, 2022
  • May 17, 2022: [Petition on Probation/SR/Bail - Order - Summons/Public Warrant]
  • May 02, 2022: [Continue]
March, 2022
  • March 14, 2022: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 07, 2022: [Continue]
  • March 07, 2022: [Bail]
February, 2022
  • February 17, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 17, 2022: [Detention Order]
  • February 15, 2022: [Stipulation to Detention and/or Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • February 15, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 15, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
April, 2021
  • April 23, 2021: [Judgment - Revocation]
  • April 23, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • April 21, 2021: [Acknowledgment of Sentencing Options]
March, 2021
  • March 16, 2021: [Continue]
February, 2021
  • February 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 16, 2021: [Continue]
  • February 12, 2021: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 12, 2021: [Order]
  • February 10, 2021: [Bail]
  • February 01, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • February 01, 2021: [Stipulation to Detention and/or Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • February 01, 2021: [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
  • February 01, 2021: [Consent to Video/Telephonic Conference Waiver to Appear in Person]
  • February 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • February 01, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • February 01, 2021: [Order]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 28, 2021: [Arrest]
December, 2020
  • December 08, 2020: [Order on Probation 12BOrder]
February, 2019
  • February 06, 2019: [Judgment]
  • February 04, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • February 04, 2019: [Acknowledgment of Sentencing Options]
January, 2019
  • January 22, 2019: [Rescheduling Hearing Notice]
  • January 22, 2019: [Order on Motion to Expedite]
  • January 22, 2019: [Telephone Conference]
  • January 16, 2019: [Expedite]
December, 2018
  • December 06, 2018: [Order on Motion for Bail]
  • December 06, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
November, 2018
  • November 20, 2018: [Report and Recommendation]
  • November 16, 2018: [Bail Hearing]
  • November 08, 2018: [Order on Motion for Bail]
  • November 08, 2018: [Referring Motion Order]
  • November 06, 2018: [Bail]
  • November 05, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 05, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
October, 2018
  • October 26, 2018: [Final Pretrial Conference]
  • October 15, 2018: [Trial Reminder]
September, 2018
  • September 21, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 20, 2018: [Trial Notice]
  • September 20, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • September 20, 2018: [Bail Revocation Hearing]
  • September 20, 2018: [Stipulation to Detention and/or Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • September 19, 2018: [Hearing Notice]
August, 2018
  • August 23, 2018: [Warrant Issued]
  • August 23, 2018: [Praecipe for Warrant]
  • August 23, 2018: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.