U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00135-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rodriguez-Hernandez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2018
  • November 09, 2018: [Judgment]
  • November 06, 2018: [Combined Change of Plea and Sentencing - Re-entry After Deportation]
October, 2018
  • October 02, 2018: [Substitute Attorney]
September, 2018
  • September 07, 2018: [Hearing Notice]
  • September 07, 2018: [Waiver of Presence at Arraignment]
  • September 07, 2018: [Acknowledgment and Waiver of Rights]
  • September 04, 2018: [Expedited Plea /Sentencing Hearing - Re-entry After Deporation]
August, 2018
  • August 24, 2018: [Warrant Issued]
  • August 24, 2018: [Praecipe for Warrant]
  • August 24, 2018: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.