U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00136-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Encarnacion
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2020
  • January 29, 2020: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
December, 2019
  • December 23, 2019: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
  • December 09, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2019
  • November 22, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2019
  • February 20, 2019: [Judgment Returned Executed]
January, 2019
  • January 02, 2019: [Judgment]
  • January 02, 2019: [Acknowledgment of Sentencing Options]
  • January 02, 2019: [Sentencing]
December, 2018
  • December 12, 2018: [Sentencing Memorandum]
September, 2018
  • September 27, 2018: [Waiver of Indictment/Plea Hearing]
  • September 27, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 26, 2018: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • September 24, 2018: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • September 24, 2018: [Detention]
  • September 14, 2018: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
August, 2018
  • August 29, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • August 29, 2018: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • August 29, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 29, 2018: [Hearing Notice]
  • August 28, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 28, 2018: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.