U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00137-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Dunn
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2020
  • March 17, 2020: [Satisfaction of Judgment]
April, 2019
  • April 23, 2019: [Transcript]
February, 2019
  • February 08, 2019: [Collateral Returned]
  • February 08, 2019: [Order on Motion for Return of Property]
  • February 08, 2019: [Return of Property]
  • February 08, 2019: [Judgment]
  • February 08, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • February 08, 2019: [Acknowledgment of Sentencing Options]
  • February 08, 2019: [Collateral Receipt]
January, 2019
  • January 22, 2019: [Collateral Returned]
October, 2018
  • October 24, 2018: [Rescheduling Hearing Notice]
  • October 15, 2018: [Order on Motion to Clarify]
  • October 15, 2018: [Motion Referred]
  • October 12, 2018: [Clarify]
  • October 04, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
September, 2018
  • September 27, 2018: [Continue]
  • September 21, 2018: [Collateral Receipt]
  • September 20, 2018: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 20, 2018: [Waiver of Indictment/Plea Hearing]
  • September 20, 2018: [Waiver of Indictment]
August, 2018
  • August 31, 2018: [Hearing Notice]
  • August 29, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 29, 2018: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.