U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00140-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Allen
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 12, 2022: [Letter]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • December 29, 2021: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
January, 2021
  • January 22, 2021: [Order on Probation 12BOrder]
April, 2019
  • April 02, 2019: [Judgment Returned Executed]
December, 2018
  • December 20, 2018: [Judgment]
  • December 19, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • December 19, 2018: [Acknowledgment of Sentencing Options]
  • December 07, 2018: [Sentencing Memorandum]
September, 2018
  • September 13, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 10, 2018: [Hearing Notice]
  • September 10, 2018: [Waiver of Indictment/Plea Hearing]
  • September 10, 2018: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • September 05, 2018: [Summons Issued]
  • September 05, 2018: [Praecipe for Summons]
  • September 04, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 04, 2018: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.