U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00145-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Diaz-Pineda
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2018
  • November 27, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • November 26, 2018: [Dismiss]
  • November 08, 2018: [Motion Hearing Notice]
  • November 07, 2018: [Dismiss]
  • November 06, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
October, 2018
  • October 25, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • October 23, 2018: [Continue Trial]
  • October 22, 2018: [Trial Reminder]
September, 2018
  • September 11, 2018: [Trial Notice]
  • September 10, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 10, 2018: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 10, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 08, 2018: [Bail]
  • September 07, 2018: [Detention Order - Temporary]
  • September 07, 2018: [Initial Appearance/Arraignment]
  • September 07, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • September 07, 2018: [Appoint Counsel]
  • September 06, 2018: [Hearing Notice]
  • September 06, 2018: [Warrant Issued]
  • September 06, 2018: [Praecipe for Warrant]
  • September 06, 2018: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.