U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00142-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hoage
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Memorandum]
  • January 12, 2023: [Continue]
  • January 11, 2023: [Exhibit List]
  • January 11, 2023: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • January 09, 2023: [Miscellaneous Filing]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Stipulation to Detention and/or Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • December 29, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • December 19, 2022: [Corrective Entry]
October, 2022
  • October 11, 2022: [Judgment - Revocation]
  • October 06, 2022: [Acknowledgment of Sentencing Options]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Continue]
  • August 04, 2022: [Amend]
July, 2022
  • July 21, 2022: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 18, 2022: [Continue]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 24, 2022: [Motion Hearing Notice]
  • June 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • June 23, 2022: [Amend]
  • June 02, 2022: [Continue]
  • June 01, 2022: [Setting Conditions of Release]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Bail]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Stipulation to Detention and/or Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • April 28, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
January, 2022
  • January 11, 2022: [Judgment - Revocation]
  • January 11, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • January 11, 2022: [Acknowledgment of Sentencing Options]
  • January 11, 2022: [Order]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Continue]
  • November 12, 2021: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 10, 2021: [Exhibit List]
  • November 10, 2021: [Bail Hearing]
  • November 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Bail]
  • November 07, 2021: [Bail]
  • November 03, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Order]
  • October 28, 2021: [Stipulation to Detention and/or Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • October 28, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • October 28, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
November, 2019
  • November 20, 2019: [Judgment]
  • November 15, 2019: [Acknowledgment of Sentencing Options]
  • November 15, 2019: [Sentencing]
October, 2019
  • October 29, 2019: [Detention Order]
  • October 17, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 17, 2019: [Stipulation to Detention and/or Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • October 17, 2019: [Bail Revocation Hearing]
  • October 16, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 16, 2019: [Continue]
  • October 15, 2019: [Petition on Probation/SR/Bail - Order - Warrant]
  • October 15, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 11, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • October 11, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 07, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum]
July, 2019
  • July 11, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 02, 2019: [Terminate Deadlines PUBLIC]
  • July 01, 2019: [Acknowledgment and Waiver of Rights]
May, 2019
  • May 20, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: [Reset Trial Deadlines PUBLIC]
  • April 29, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • April 25, 2019: [Continue Trial]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • February 15, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • February 14, 2019: [Continue Trial]
  • February 13, 2019: [Rescheduling Hearing Notice]
January, 2019
  • January 30, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • January 25, 2019: [Clerk's Notice - Filing Due]
  • January 24, 2019: [Substitute Attorney]
  • January 08, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • January 08, 2019: [Continue Trial]
  • January 02, 2019: [Order on Motion for Return of Property]
December, 2018
  • December 28, 2018: [Trial Reminder]
  • December 21, 2018: [Return of Property]
October, 2018
  • October 24, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • October 19, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • October 12, 2018: [Continue Trial]
  • October 11, 2018: [Substitute Attorney]
September, 2018
  • September 25, 2018: [Trial Notice]
  • September 19, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 18, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • September 18, 2018: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 18, 2018: [Initial Appearance/Arraignment]
  • September 18, 2018: [Appoint Counsel]
  • September 18, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • September 17, 2018: [Hearing Notice]
  • September 17, 2018: [Arrest]
  • September 06, 2018: [Warrant Issued]
  • September 06, 2018: [Praecipe for Warrant]
  • September 06, 2018: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.