U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00141-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Fuentes
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2018
  • November 20, 2018: [Judgment]
  • November 19, 2018: [Combined Change of Plea and Sentencing - Re-entry After Deportation]
  • November 13, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
October, 2018
  • October 24, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • October 22, 2018: [Clerk's Notice - Filing Due]
  • October 05, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • October 04, 2018: [Continue Trial]
  • October 04, 2018: [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
  • October 04, 2018: [Acknowledgment and Waiver of Rights]
  • October 03, 2018: [Expedited Plea /Sentencing Hearing - Re-entry After Deporation]
September, 2018
  • September 17, 2018: [Trial Notice]
  • September 14, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 13, 2018: [Stipulation to Detention and/or Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • September 13, 2018: [Initial Appearance/Arraignment]
  • September 13, 2018: [Appoint Counsel]
  • September 13, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • September 07, 2018: [Hearing Notice]
  • September 06, 2018: [Warrant Issued]
  • September 06, 2018: [Praecipe for Warrant]
  • September 06, 2018: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.