U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00144-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Philipov
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 27, 2020: [Judgment]
  • August 27, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • August 27, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • August 27, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • August 27, 2020: [Acknowledgment of Sentencing Options]
  • August 24, 2020: [Response - not to motion]
  • August 17, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: [Rescheduling Hearing Notice]
September, 2019
  • September 25, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment/Plea Hearing]
  • September 25, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • September 25, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 25, 2019: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • September 04, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
August, 2019
  • August 22, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • August 21, 2019: [Continue Trial]
  • August 21, 2019: [Notice - Other]
  • August 20, 2019: [Terminate Deadlines PUBLIC]
May, 2019
  • May 21, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • May 20, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • May 14, 2019: [Continue Trial]
February, 2019
  • February 11, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • February 07, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • February 05, 2019: [ECF - Filing Error - Action Required]
  • February 05, 2019: [Continue Trial]
November, 2018
  • November 15, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • November 13, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • November 09, 2018: [Terminate Motions PUBLIC]
  • November 09, 2018: [Continue Trial]
  • November 09, 2018: [Trial Reminder]
October, 2018
  • October 24, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 09, 2018: [Trial Notice]
  • October 09, 2018: [Stipulation to Detention and/or Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • October 09, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • October 01, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 01, 2018: [Hearing Notice]
September, 2018
  • September 27, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
  • September 27, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 17, 2018: [Removal/Rule 5c 3 Documents Received]
  • September 07, 2018: [Warrant Issued]
  • September 07, 2018: [Praecipe for Warrant]
  • September 07, 2018: [Indictment]
  • September 07, 2018: [Arrest - Other District]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.