U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00149-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Villar
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2019
  • March 21, 2019: [Judgment Returned Executed]
January, 2019
  • January 18, 2019: [Judgment]
  • January 17, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • January 17, 2019: [Acknowledgment of Sentencing Options]
  • January 07, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • January 03, 2019: [Notice - Other]
October, 2018
  • October 12, 2018: [Waiver of Indictment/Plea Hearing]
  • October 12, 2018: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • October 11, 2018: [Substitute Attorney]
September, 2018
  • September 18, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 13, 2018: [Hearing Notice]
  • September 13, 2018: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.