U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00131-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Fysh
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Objection to Motion]
  • February 21, 2022: [Addendum]
  • February 14, 2022: [Amend]
  • February 08, 2022: [Compassionate Release]
January, 2022
  • January 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Time to Object/Respond]
  • January 12, 2022: [Extend Time to Object/Respond]
December, 2021
  • December 06, 2021: [Extend Time]
November, 2021
  • November 04, 2021: [Extend Time]
October, 2021
  • October 05, 2021: [Extend Time]
September, 2021
  • September 20, 2021: [Addendum]
  • September 15, 2021: [Compassionate Release]
February, 2021
  • February 17, 2021: [Sentencing Letter/Impact Statement - Public]
  • February 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • February 07, 2021: [Objection to Motion]
January, 2021
  • January 28, 2021: [Reconsideration]
  • January 15, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
September, 2020
  • September 16, 2020: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
August, 2020
  • August 25, 2020: [Objection to Motion]
  • August 13, 2020: [Compassionate Release]
  • August 13, 2020: [Leave to File]
July, 2020
  • July 29, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • July 28, 2020: [Extend Time]
June, 2020
  • June 24, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
December, 2019
  • December 20, 2019: [CJA 20 Payment Information]
November, 2019
  • November 25, 2019: [Receipt of Exhibits]
  • November 18, 2019: [Return of Exhibits]
September, 2019
  • September 13, 2019: [Judgment]
  • September 13, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • September 13, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • September 12, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • September 11, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • September 11, 2019: [Acknowledgment of Sentencing Options]
  • September 08, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • August 30, 2019: [Cure Notice - Action Requested]
  • August 30, 2019: [Leave to File]
June, 2019
  • June 12, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment/Plea Hearing]
  • June 12, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
May, 2019
  • May 28, 2019: [Terminate Deadlines PUBLIC]
  • May 21, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 19, 2019: [Continue]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 30, 2019: [Information - Felony]
March, 2019
  • March 06, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
February, 2019
  • February 22, 2019: [Motion Hearing Notice]
  • February 06, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
January, 2019
  • January 18, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • January 11, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • January 09, 2019: [Continue Trial]
October, 2018
  • October 29, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • October 26, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • October 23, 2018: [Continue Trial]
  • October 01, 2018: [Order]
  • October 01, 2018: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
September, 2018
  • September 30, 2018: [Protective Order]
  • September 21, 2018: [Detention Order]
  • September 20, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • September 20, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 17, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 17, 2018: [Trial Notice]
  • September 14, 2018: [Order]
  • September 14, 2018: [Notice - ECF]
  • September 14, 2018: [Detention Order - Temporary]
  • September 14, 2018: [Initial Appearance/Arraignment]
  • September 14, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • September 14, 2018: [Appoint Counsel]
  • September 14, 2018: [Hearing Notice]
  • September 14, 2018: [Case Unsealed]
  • September 14, 2018: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.