U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00150-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sanborn
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice - Other]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
  • March 27, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
June, 2019
  • June 05, 2019: [Judgment]
  • June 05, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • June 05, 2019: [Sentencing]
March, 2019
  • March 01, 2019: [In Chambers Conference]
  • March 01, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 01, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
December, 2018
  • December 18, 2018: [Miscellaneous Filing]
  • December 12, 2018: [Clerk's Notice - Filing Due]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • November 30, 2018: [Notice - Other]
  • November 29, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • November 29, 2018: [Order]
  • November 29, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 28, 2018: [Continue Trial]
  • November 27, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 27, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • November 21, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 19, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • November 19, 2018: [Order]
  • November 17, 2018: [Continue Trial]
October, 2018
  • October 09, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • October 04, 2018: [Order]
  • October 03, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • October 02, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • October 02, 2018: [Order]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 28, 2018: [Trial Notice]
  • September 27, 2018: [Continue Trial]
  • September 27, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • September 27, 2018: [Stipulation to Detention and/or Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • September 27, 2018: [Appoint Counsel]
  • September 27, 2018: [Initial Appearance/Arraignment]
  • September 25, 2018: [Hearing Notice]
  • September 20, 2018: [Warrant Issued]
  • September 20, 2018: [Praecipe for Warrant]
  • September 20, 2018: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.