U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00151-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Aubin
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Satisfaction of Judgment]
September, 2019
  • September 04, 2019: [Judgment]
  • September 03, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • September 03, 2019: [Acknowledgment of Sentencing Options]
August, 2019
  • August 26, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • August 16, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • August 05, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • August 01, 2019: [Extend Time]
June, 2019
  • June 19, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 18, 2019: [Continue]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: [Attorney Withdrawal]
  • April 23, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 12, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 12, 2019: [Rescheduling Hearing Notice]
  • April 04, 2019: [Acknowledgment and Waiver of Rights]
February, 2019
  • February 27, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • February 21, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • February 20, 2019: [Continue Trial]
November, 2018
  • November 28, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • November 15, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • November 14, 2018: [Continue Trial]
  • November 09, 2018: [Trial Reminder]
October, 2018
  • October 11, 2018: [Substitute Attorney]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 27, 2018: [Trial Notice]
  • September 27, 2018: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 27, 2018: [Initial Appearance/Arraignment]
  • September 27, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • September 27, 2018: [Appoint Counsel]
  • September 26, 2018: [Hearing Notice]
  • September 26, 2018: [Arrest]
  • September 20, 2018: [Warrant Issued]
  • September 20, 2018: [Praecipe for Warrant]
  • September 20, 2018: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.