U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00095-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Barrera
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 02, 2020: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
March, 2019
  • March 26, 2019: [Judgment Returned Executed]
February, 2019
  • February 14, 2019: [Judgment]
  • February 11, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • February 11, 2019: [Acknowledgment of Sentencing Options]
  • February 01, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum]
October, 2018
  • October 30, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 17, 2018: [Terminate Deadlines PUBLIC]
  • October 15, 2018: [Hearing Notice]
  • October 15, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 15, 2018: [Trial Reminder]
September, 2018
  • September 26, 2018: [ECF - Filing Error - Action Required]
  • September 26, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.