U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00152-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Minarcin
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines PUBLIC]
  • April 17, 2025: [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
  • April 14, 2025: [Request to Dismiss Probation Petition]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • March 21, 2025: [Amend]
  • March 20, 2025: [Substitute Attorney]
January, 2025
  • January 10, 2025: [Stipulation to Detention and/or Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Order on Probation 12BOrder]
January, 2020
  • January 13, 2020: [CJA 20 Payment Information]
April, 2019
  • April 22, 2019: [Judgment]
  • April 22, 2019: [Forfeiture Order]
  • April 19, 2019: [Acknowledgment of Sentencing Options]
  • April 19, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • April 19, 2019: [Addendum]
  • April 11, 2019: [Forfeiture]
  • April 08, 2019: [Response - not to motion]
  • April 05, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum]
March, 2019
  • March 21, 2019: [Continue]
  • March 20, 2019: [Transcript]
  • March 05, 2019: [Service by Publication]
February, 2019
  • February 19, 2019: [Continue]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 31, 2019: [Continue]
  • January 10, 2019: [Forfeiture Order]
  • January 10, 2019: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
November, 2018
  • November 28, 2018: [Forfeiture]
  • November 01, 2018: [Waiver of Indictment/Plea Hearing]
  • November 01, 2018: [Waiver of Indictment]
September, 2018
  • September 27, 2018: [Hearing Notice]
  • September 27, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 27, 2018: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.