U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00153-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Uribe-Arias
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2018
  • November 06, 2018: [Waiver of Indictment/Plea Hearing]
October, 2018
  • October 26, 2018: [Rescheduling Hearing Notice]
  • October 22, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 18, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: [Hearing Notice]
  • September 28, 2018: [Expedited Plea /Sentencing Hearing - Re-entry After Deporation]
  • September 27, 2018: [Acknowledgment and Waiver of Rights]
  • September 27, 2018: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.