U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00154-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Doan
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 03, 2024: [Writ Returned]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Answer to Writ of Garnishment]
  • September 30, 2024: [Sealed Motion - Court Use]
June, 2022
  • June 23, 2022: [Order]
  • June 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release of Funds]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Release of Funds]
  • May 06, 2022: [Writ Returned]
  • May 05, 2022: [Answer to Writ of Garnishment]
  • May 04, 2022: [Sealed Motion - Court Use]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Writ Returned]
  • April 27, 2022: [Answer to Writ of Garnishment]
  • April 27, 2022: [Order on Sealed Motion]
October, 2018
  • October 03, 2018: [Transfer In/Probationer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.