U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00158-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Carr
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Letter]
  • June 28, 2019: [Transcript]
  • June 20, 2019: [Judgment Returned Executed]
March, 2019
  • March 22, 2019: [Judgment - Amended]
  • March 20, 2019: [Judgment]
  • March 20, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • March 20, 2019: [Acknowledgment of Sentencing Options]
  • March 12, 2019: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 12, 2019: [Forfeiture Order]
  • March 12, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 12, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 12, 2019: [Continue]
  • March 12, 2019: [Terminate Deadlines PUBLIC]
  • March 11, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 11, 2019: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 08, 2019: [Witness List]
  • March 08, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • March 04, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum]
December, 2018
  • December 06, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • December 06, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 03, 2018: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • December 03, 2018: [Rescheduling Hearing Notice]
November, 2018
  • November 27, 2018: [Acknowledgment and Waiver of Rights]
  • November 13, 2018: [Trial Reminder]
October, 2018
  • October 12, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 11, 2018: [Trial Notice]
  • October 11, 2018: [Stipulation to Detention and/or Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • October 11, 2018: [Initial Appearance/Arraignment]
  • October 11, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • October 11, 2018: [Appoint Counsel]
  • October 09, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • October 09, 2018: [Substitute Attorney]
  • October 09, 2018: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • October 09, 2018: [Hearing Notice]
  • October 04, 2018: [Warrant Issued]
  • October 04, 2018: [Praecipe for Warrant]
  • October 04, 2018: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.