U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00160-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Flores-Mora
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 17, 2022: [Receipt of Exhibits]
January, 2022
  • January 18, 2022: [Receipt of Exhibits]
  • January 13, 2022: [Return of Exhibits]
November, 2021
  • November 08, 2021: [Mandate]
October, 2021
  • October 18, 2021: [Judgment]
February, 2021
  • February 02, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • February 01, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2019
  • October 04, 2019: [Transcript - Redacted]
September, 2019
  • September 24, 2019: [Transcript - Jury Selection]
  • September 24, 2019: [Transcript]
  • September 10, 2019: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • September 06, 2019: [Modify Conditions of Release]
August, 2019
  • August 26, 2019: [Transcript]
  • August 20, 2019: [Transcript]
July, 2019
  • July 29, 2019: [Transcript]
  • July 09, 2019: [Appellate Case Number]
  • July 08, 2019: [Clerks Certificate/Appeal Record Sent to USCA]
  • July 08, 2019: [Appeal Cover Sheet]
June, 2019
  • June 27, 2019: [Notice of Appeal]
  • June 27, 2019: [Judgment]
  • June 27, 2019: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • June 27, 2019: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • June 17, 2019: [Acknowledgment of Sentencing Options]
  • June 17, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • June 13, 2019: [Objection - not to motion]
  • June 04, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum]
April, 2019
  • April 01, 2019: [Order]
March, 2019
  • March 07, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • March 07, 2019: [Jury Verdict]
  • March 07, 2019: [Court Instructions]
  • March 07, 2019: [Jury Trial]
  • March 07, 2019: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • March 07, 2019: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • March 06, 2019: [Jury Selection]
  • March 05, 2019: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • March 04, 2019: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • March 01, 2019: [Jury Selection List]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • February 28, 2019: [Terminate Deadlines PUBLIC]
  • February 27, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 26, 2019: [Witness List]
  • February 26, 2019: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • February 26, 2019: [Final Pretrial Order]
  • February 26, 2019: [Continue Trial]
  • February 25, 2019: [Juror Questionnaires]
  • February 25, 2019: [In Limine]
January, 2019
  • January 25, 2019: [Reply to Objection to Motion]
  • January 16, 2019: [Transcript]
  • January 15, 2019: [Notice - Other]
  • January 15, 2019: [Objection to Motion]
  • January 10, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • January 10, 2019: [Objection to Motion]
  • January 07, 2019: [Addendum]
  • January 07, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • January 04, 2019: [Order]
  • January 04, 2019: [Continue Trial]
  • January 04, 2019: [Final Pretrial Conference]
  • January 04, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • January 03, 2019: [Juror Questionnaires - Supplement]
  • January 03, 2019: [Jury Selection List]
  • January 03, 2019: [Objection to Motion]
  • January 02, 2019: [Juror Questionnaires]
December, 2018
  • December 31, 2018: [Witness List]
  • December 28, 2018: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • December 27, 2018: [Reconsideration]
  • December 26, 2018: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • December 21, 2018: [In Limine]
  • December 21, 2018: [Objection to Motion]
  • December 11, 2018: [Suppress]
  • December 07, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • December 06, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • December 06, 2018: [Clerk's Notice - Filing Due]
November, 2018
  • November 26, 2018: [Order]
  • November 26, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • November 20, 2018: [Continue Trial]
  • November 20, 2018: [Trial Reminder]
  • November 19, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • November 11, 2018: [Addendum]
  • November 07, 2018: [Order]
  • November 06, 2018: [Appearance Bond]
October, 2018
  • October 29, 2018: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 29, 2018: [Objection to Motion]
  • October 26, 2018: [Telephone Conference]
  • October 26, 2018: [Hearing Notice]
  • October 24, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 23, 2018: [Rescheduling Hearing Notice]
  • October 22, 2018: [Objection to Motion]
  • October 18, 2018: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • October 17, 2018: [Motion Hearing Notice]
  • October 17, 2018: [Order]
  • October 15, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 15, 2018: [Dismiss]
  • October 09, 2018: [Trial Notice]
  • October 09, 2018: [Waiver of Presence at Arraignment]
  • October 09, 2018: [In Chambers Conference]
  • October 09, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 09, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 04, 2018: [Warrant Issued]
  • October 04, 2018: [Praecipe for Warrant]
  • October 04, 2018: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.