U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00159-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rivas
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2019
  • March 21, 2019: [Judgment Returned Executed]
February, 2019
  • February 08, 2019: [Judgment]
  • February 08, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • February 04, 2019: [Acknowledgment of Sentencing Options]
January, 2019
  • January 28, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum]
November, 2018
  • November 02, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • November 02, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
October, 2018
  • October 30, 2018: [Acknowledgment and Waiver of Rights]
  • October 16, 2018: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • October 15, 2018: [Terminate Deadlines PUBLIC]
  • October 15, 2018: [Rescheduling Hearing Notice]
  • October 05, 2018: [Hearing Notice]
  • October 05, 2018: [Warrant Issued]
  • October 05, 2018: [Praecipe for Warrant]
  • October 05, 2018: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.