U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00161-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bardzik
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2020
  • March 03, 2020: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
  • March 02, 2020: [Response to Motion]
February, 2020
  • February 24, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • February 13, 2020: [Early Termination of Probation]
February, 2019
  • February 05, 2019: [Judgment]
  • February 05, 2019: [Acknowledgment of Sentencing Options]
  • February 05, 2019: [Sentencing]
October, 2018
  • October 30, 2018: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 30, 2018: [Consent to US Magistrate Judge]
  • October 30, 2018: [Plea Hearing]
  • October 15, 2018: [Hearing Notice]
  • October 15, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 15, 2018: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.