U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00167-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Duncan
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2019
  • June 19, 2019: [Judgment]
  • June 17, 2019: [Acknowledgment of Sentencing Options]
  • June 17, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • June 07, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum]
May, 2019
  • May 23, 2019: [Addendum]
  • May 09, 2019: [Rescheduling Hearing Notice]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 19, 2019: [Hearing Notice]
  • February 19, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
January, 2019
  • January 15, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • January 14, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • January 12, 2019: [Continue Trial]
November, 2018
  • November 09, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • November 05, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • November 02, 2018: [Continue Trial]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • October 25, 2018: [Trial Notice]
  • October 25, 2018: [Waiver of Presence at Arraignment]
  • October 18, 2018: [Warrant Issued]
  • October 18, 2018: [Praecipe for Warrant]
  • October 18, 2018: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.