U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00169-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Davidson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 10, 2022: [Collateral Return Acknowledgment]
July, 2021
  • July 14, 2021: [Letter]
March, 2021
  • March 29, 2021: [Receipt of Exhibits]
  • March 24, 2021: [Receipt of Exhibits]
  • March 17, 2021: [Return of Exhibits]
October, 2020
  • October 22, 2020: [Order on Motion for Return of Property]
  • October 20, 2020: [Return of Property]
  • October 19, 2020: [Miscellaneous Filing]
  • October 08, 2020: [Collateral Returned]
  • October 08, 2020: [Letter]
  • October 08, 2020: [Order]
September, 2020
  • September 04, 2020: [Transcript]
July, 2020
  • July 17, 2020: [Judgment]
  • July 16, 2020: [Acknowledgment of Sentencing Options]
  • July 16, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • July 16, 2020: [Exhibit]
  • July 15, 2020: [Exhibit]
  • July 14, 2020: [Affidavit]
  • July 12, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • July 09, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • July 08, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
June, 2020
  • June 29, 2020: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • June 09, 2020: [Rescheduling Hearing Notice]
  • June 01, 2020: [In Chambers Conference]
March, 2020
  • March 02, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 02, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
January, 2020
  • January 29, 2020: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • January 17, 2020: [Stipulation]
  • January 17, 2020: [Order]
  • January 17, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • January 13, 2020: [Continue Trial]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 08, 2019: [Response to Motion]
September, 2019
  • September 26, 2019: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • September 11, 2019: [Transcript]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • August 29, 2019: [Clerk's Notice - Filing Due]
  • August 14, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • August 12, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • August 12, 2019: [Order]
  • August 02, 2019: [Objection to Motion]
  • August 02, 2019: [Continue Trial]
July, 2019
  • July 26, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 26, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • July 26, 2019: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • July 24, 2019: [Witness List]
  • July 10, 2019: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • July 10, 2019: [Sealed Motion - Court Use]
  • July 09, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • July 08, 2019: [Objection to Motion]
  • July 08, 2019: [Leave to File]
  • July 01, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
June, 2019
  • June 27, 2019: [Addendum]
  • June 27, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • June 26, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • June 26, 2019: [Order]
  • June 26, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend Time to Object/Respond]
  • June 25, 2019: [Extend Time to Object/Respond]
  • June 24, 2019: [Continue Trial]
  • June 21, 2019: [Motion Hearing Notice]
  • June 19, 2019: [Collateral Returned]
  • June 19, 2019: [Collateral Receipt]
  • June 17, 2019: [Suppress]
  • June 17, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 14, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 11, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • March 11, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 07, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • March 05, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 01, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 01, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • March 01, 2019: [Order]
February, 2019
  • February 26, 2019: [Continue Trial]
  • February 26, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 20, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • February 19, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • February 15, 2019: [Court Ordered Funds Deposited]
  • February 01, 2019: [Terminate Deadlines PUBLIC]
January, 2019
  • January 30, 2019: [Waiver of Presence at Arraignment]
  • January 29, 2019: [Summons Returned Unexecuted]
  • January 22, 2019: [Summons Issued]
  • January 22, 2019: [Praecipe for Summons]
  • January 22, 2019: [Indictment - Superseding]
December, 2018
  • December 11, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • December 06, 2018: [Stipulation]
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: [Set Deadlines PUBLIC]
  • November 29, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • November 29, 2018: [Order]
  • November 28, 2018: [Telephone Conference]
  • November 27, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • November 26, 2018: [Hearing Notice]
  • November 19, 2018: [Order]
  • November 14, 2018: [Continue Trial]
  • November 01, 2018: [Trial Notice]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
  • October 31, 2018: [Waiver of Presence at Arraignment]
  • October 29, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 23, 2018: [Summons Issued]
  • October 23, 2018: [Praecipe for Summons]
  • October 23, 2018: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.