U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00170-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Borak
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2019
  • May 24, 2019: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • May 24, 2019: [Modify Conditions of Release]
February, 2019
  • February 25, 2019: [Judgment]
  • February 21, 2019: [Acknowledgment of Sentencing Options]
  • February 21, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • February 19, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • February 19, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 15, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 15, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum]
November, 2018
  • November 13, 2018: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 13, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
October, 2018
  • October 23, 2018: [Hearing Notice]
  • October 23, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 23, 2018: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.