U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00162-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Colwell
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 02, 2021: [Acknowledgment of Sentencing Options]
  • June 02, 2021: [Judgment]
  • June 01, 2021: [Sentencing]
May, 2021
  • May 21, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum]
April, 2021
  • April 22, 2021: [Continue]
March, 2021
  • March 01, 2021: [Continue]
December, 2020
  • December 02, 2020: [Continue]
March, 2020
  • March 30, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 30, 2020: [Continue]
  • March 30, 2020: [Telephone Conference]
May, 2019
  • May 09, 2019: [Rescheduling Hearing Notice]
  • May 03, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • May 02, 2019: [Amend]
March, 2019
  • March 04, 2019: [Corrective Entry]
  • March 04, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
February, 2019
  • February 22, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 21, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 20, 2019: [Hearing Notice]
January, 2019
  • January 22, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • January 22, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • January 18, 2019: [Continue Trial]
  • January 15, 2019: [Trial Reminder]
  • January 10, 2019: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
October, 2018
  • October 24, 2018: [Case Unsealed]
  • October 24, 2018: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.