U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00166-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Decologero
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 06, 2023: [Letter]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Judgment]
  • November 18, 2022: [Acknowledgment of Sentencing Options]
  • November 18, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • November 15, 2022: [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
  • November 11, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum]
September, 2022
  • September 14, 2022: [Continue]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Continue]
April, 2022
  • April 22, 2022: [Continue]
  • April 22, 2022: [Stipulation to Detention and/or Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • April 20, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 14, 2022: [Continue]
  • April 04, 2022: [Rescheduling Hearing Notice]
March, 2022
  • March 09, 2022: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 02, 2022: [Removal/Rule 5c 3 Documents Received]
  • March 02, 2022: [Bail Revocation Hearing]
February, 2022
  • February 17, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 16, 2022: [Arrest - Other District]
July, 2021
  • July 14, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
June, 2021
  • June 24, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines PUBLIC]
  • June 24, 2021: [Order]
  • June 24, 2021: [Request to Dismiss Probation Petition]
  • June 17, 2021: [Petition on Probation/SR/Bail - Order - Summons/Public Warrant]
October, 2020
  • October 23, 2020: [Administrative Closure]
  • October 23, 2020: [LASER - Notice]
  • October 02, 2020: [Continue]
July, 2020
  • July 24, 2020: [Continue]
May, 2020
  • May 22, 2020: [Continue]
February, 2020
  • February 25, 2020: [Continue]
December, 2019
  • December 23, 2019: [Continue]
October, 2019
  • October 11, 2019: [Continue]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: [Continue]
May, 2019
  • May 30, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 28, 2019: [Continue]
March, 2019
  • March 07, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
February, 2019
  • February 25, 2019: [Hearing Notice]
  • February 25, 2019: [Acknowledgment and Waiver of Rights]
  • February 15, 2019: [Clerk's Notice - Filing Due]
December, 2018
  • December 26, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • December 26, 2018: [Order]
  • December 20, 2018: [Continue Trial]
  • December 18, 2018: [Trial Reminder]
November, 2018
  • November 08, 2018: [Trial Notice]
  • November 07, 2018: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 07, 2018: [Initial Appearance/Arraignment]
  • November 07, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • November 07, 2018: [Appoint Counsel]
October, 2018
  • October 24, 2018: [Summons Issued]
  • October 24, 2018: [Praecipe for Summons]
  • October 24, 2018: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.