U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00179-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Mann
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 14, 2020: [CJA 20 Payment Information]
January, 2020
  • January 09, 2020: [Judgment]
  • January 06, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • January 06, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • January 06, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • January 06, 2020: [Acknowledgment of Sentencing Options]
December, 2019
  • December 27, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum]
November, 2019
  • November 22, 2019: [Continue]
  • November 21, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 20, 2019: [Continue]
  • November 19, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum]
August, 2019
  • August 19, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 19, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 02, 2019: [Terminate Deadlines PUBLIC]
May, 2019
  • May 10, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • May 01, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: [Continue Trial]
  • April 26, 2019: [Trial Reminder]
  • April 17, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 10, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
February, 2019
  • February 19, 2019: [Notice - Other]
  • February 14, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 14, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 11, 2019: [Rescheduling Motion Hearing Notice]
  • February 07, 2019: [Motion Hearing Notice]
  • February 07, 2019: [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
  • February 07, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 07, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
January, 2019
  • January 24, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • January 23, 2019: [Addendum]
  • January 22, 2019: [Continue Trial]
November, 2018
  • November 28, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • November 15, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • November 13, 2018: [Continue Trial]
  • November 08, 2018: [Detention Order]
  • November 07, 2018: [Trial Notice]
  • November 07, 2018: [Initial Appearance/Arraignment]
  • November 07, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 07, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • November 07, 2018: [Appoint Counsel]
  • November 06, 2018: [Rescheduling Hearing Notice]
  • November 05, 2018: [Hearing Notice]
  • November 02, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • November 01, 2018: [Warrant Issued]
  • November 01, 2018: [Praecipe for Warrant]
  • November 01, 2018: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.