U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:05-cr-00253-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MacLeod
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [CJA 20 Payment Information]
October, 2021
  • October 19, 2021: [Judgment - Revocation]
  • October 19, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • October 19, 2021: [Acknowledgment of Sentencing Options]
September, 2021
  • September 20, 2021: [Petition on Probation/SR/Bail - Order - Summons/Public Warrant]
  • September 03, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
August, 2021
  • August 26, 2021: [Stipulation to Detention and/or Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • August 26, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • August 26, 2021: [Consent to Video/Telephonic Conference Waiver to Appear in Person]
  • August 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • August 26, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • August 26, 2021: [Order]
  • August 26, 2021: [Substitute Attorney]
  • August 25, 2021: [Hearing Notice]
  • August 25, 2021: [Arrest]
May, 2020
  • May 07, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
December, 2019
  • December 20, 2019: [Order on Probation 12BOrder]
December, 2018
  • December 24, 2018: [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
  • December 20, 2018: [Summons Returned Unexecuted]
  • December 20, 2018: [Request to Dismiss Probation Petition]
November, 2018
  • November 28, 2018: [Rescheduling Hearing Notice]
  • November 27, 2018: [Summons Returned Unexecuted]
  • November 01, 2018: [Summons Issued]
  • November 01, 2018: [Petition on Probation/SR/Bail - Order - Summons/Public Warrant]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.