U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00180-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Wilson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [CJA 20 Payment Information]
  • November 18, 2022: [CJA 21 Payment Information]
October, 2022
  • October 12, 2022: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • October 12, 2022: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
September, 2022
  • September 08, 2022: [Judgment]
  • September 07, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • September 07, 2022: [Acknowledgment of Sentencing Options]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • August 29, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum]
May, 2022
  • May 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 09, 2022: [Continue]
February, 2022
  • February 01, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment/Plea Hearing]
  • February 01, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment]
January, 2022
  • January 18, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 18, 2022: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • November 23, 2021: [Continue Trial]
  • November 17, 2021: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • November 16, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 09, 2021: [Objection to Motion]
  • November 05, 2021: [Discovery]
October, 2021
  • October 06, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • October 01, 2021: [Hearing]
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • September 22, 2021: [Continue Trial]
  • September 17, 2021: [In Chambers Conference]
  • September 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • September 13, 2021: [Hearing]
August, 2021
  • August 11, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • August 09, 2021: [Continue Trial]
May, 2021
  • May 06, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • May 03, 2021: [Continue Trial]
January, 2021
  • January 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • January 11, 2021: [Continue Trial]
  • January 04, 2021: [Endorsed Order - Trial Status Report]
August, 2020
  • August 27, 2020: [Continue Trial]
June, 2020
  • June 22, 2020: [Order]
  • June 01, 2020: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 01, 2020: [Bail Hearing]
May, 2020
  • May 28, 2020: [Order on Motion for Bail]
  • May 27, 2020: [Order]
  • May 13, 2020: [Bail]
April, 2020
  • April 20, 2020: [Order]
  • April 20, 2020: [Reset Trial Deadlines PUBLIC]
March, 2020
  • March 17, 2020: [Objection to Motion]
  • March 11, 2020: [Transcript]
  • March 05, 2020: [Extend Time to Object/Respond]
  • March 04, 2020: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
February, 2020
  • February 25, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • February 25, 2020: [Continue Trial]
  • February 25, 2020: [Suppress]
January, 2020
  • January 29, 2020: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • January 16, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • January 15, 2020: [Continue Trial]
  • January 08, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
December, 2019
  • December 31, 2019: [Leave to File]
  • December 10, 2019: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
November, 2019
  • November 13, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • November 05, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Continue Trial]
  • October 15, 2019: [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
  • October 03, 2019: [Final Pretrial Conference]
September, 2019
  • September 20, 2019: [Memorandum]
  • September 13, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 12, 2019: [Order]
  • September 12, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • September 11, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 10, 2019: [Witness List]
August, 2019
  • August 14, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • August 06, 2019: [Rescheduling Hearing Notice]
  • August 06, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • August 05, 2019: [Continue Trial]
  • August 05, 2019: [Continue]
July, 2019
  • July 02, 2019: [Clerk's Notice - Filing Due]
June, 2019
  • June 13, 2019: [Rescheduling Motion Hearing Notice]
  • June 11, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • June 10, 2019: [Continue]
  • June 04, 2019: [Terminate Deadlines PUBLIC]
  • June 04, 2019: [Motion Hearing Notice]
May, 2019
  • May 24, 2019: [Objection to Motion]
  • May 14, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend Time to Object/Respond]
  • May 13, 2019: [Extend Time to Object/Respond]
  • May 10, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 07, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • May 03, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • May 01, 2019: [Continue Trial]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: [Suppress]
  • April 02, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 01, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 01, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
March, 2019
  • March 26, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • March 22, 2019: [Continue Trial]
December, 2018
  • December 06, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • December 04, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • December 04, 2018: [Continue Trial]
November, 2018
  • November 27, 2018: [Notice - Other]
  • November 27, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 20, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 13, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 13, 2018: [Trial Reminder]
  • November 09, 2018: [Trial Notice]
  • November 08, 2018: [Stipulation to Detention and/or Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • November 08, 2018: [Initial Appearance/Arraignment]
  • November 08, 2018: [Appoint Counsel]
  • November 08, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • November 07, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • November 07, 2018: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • November 05, 2018: [Hearing Notice]
  • November 01, 2018: [Warrant Issued]
  • November 01, 2018: [Praecipe for Warrant]
  • November 01, 2018: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.