U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00176-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Dos Santos-Goncalves
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2019
  • January 25, 2019: [Judgment]
  • January 17, 2019: [Combined Change of Plea and Sentencing - Re-entry After Deportation]
December, 2018
  • December 21, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • December 14, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: [Continue Trial]
  • November 29, 2018: [Acknowledgment and Waiver of Rights]
  • November 29, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 27, 2018: [Expedited Plea /Sentencing Hearing - Re-entry After Deporation]
  • November 26, 2018: [Reset Trial Deadlines PUBLIC]
  • November 20, 2018: [Trial Reminder]
  • November 16, 2018: [Trial Notice]
  • November 08, 2018: [Stipulation to Detention and/or Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • November 08, 2018: [Initial Appearance/Arraignment]
  • November 08, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • November 08, 2018: [Appoint Counsel]
  • November 06, 2018: [Hearing Notice]
  • November 02, 2018: [Warrant Issued]
  • November 02, 2018: [Praecipe for Warrant]
  • November 02, 2018: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.