U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00178-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Tsiros
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: [Continue]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [CJA 21 Payment Information]
  • August 13, 2020: [CJA 20 Payment Information]
December, 2019
  • December 12, 2019: [Judgment]
  • December 12, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • December 11, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • December 11, 2019: [Acknowledgment of Sentencing Options]
  • December 10, 2019: [Seal Document-Court Use]
  • December 09, 2019: [Objection - not to motion]
  • December 06, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • December 03, 2019: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
September, 2019
  • September 12, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 10, 2019: [Continue]
July, 2019
  • July 09, 2019: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • July 03, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment/Plea Hearing]
  • July 03, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • July 03, 2019: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • July 02, 2019: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • July 01, 2019: [Waiver of Presence at Arraignment]
  • July 01, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
June, 2019
  • June 20, 2019: [Trial Reminder]
  • June 13, 2019: [Praecipe for Warrant]
  • June 13, 2019: [Indictment - Superseding]
April, 2019
  • April 12, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • April 10, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • April 05, 2019: [Continue Trial]
February, 2019
  • February 22, 2019: [Rescheduling Hearing Notice]
  • February 12, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • February 08, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • February 06, 2019: [Continue Trial]
December, 2018
  • December 07, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • December 06, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • December 05, 2018: [Continue Trial]
  • December 04, 2018: [ECF - Filing Error - Action Required]
  • December 03, 2018: [Continue Trial]
November, 2018
  • November 21, 2018: [Notice - Other]
  • November 21, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 09, 2018: [Trial Notice]
  • November 09, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 09, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 09, 2018: [Stipulation to Detention and/or Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • November 09, 2018: [Initial Appearance/Arraignment]
  • November 09, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • November 09, 2018: [Appoint Counsel]
  • November 05, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • November 02, 2018: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • November 02, 2018: [Hearing Notice]
  • November 02, 2018: [Warrant Issued]
  • November 02, 2018: [Praecipe for Warrant]
  • November 02, 2018: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.