U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00177-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Van Nest
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 21, 2020: [Acknowledgment of Sentencing Options]
  • December 16, 2020: [Judgment]
  • December 16, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • December 06, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
November, 2020
  • November 16, 2020: [Miscellaneous Filing]
September, 2020
  • September 15, 2020: [Violations of Conditions - LASER]
July, 2020
  • July 17, 2020: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 07, 2020: [Order]
December, 2019
  • December 02, 2019: [Order]
September, 2019
  • September 06, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • September 06, 2019: [In Chambers Conference]
  • September 06, 2019: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • September 06, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
  • September 06, 2019: [Administrative Closure]
  • September 06, 2019: [LASER - Notice]
June, 2019
  • June 26, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 21, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 14, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • June 10, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • June 10, 2019: [Order]
  • June 07, 2019: [Continue Trial]
  • June 03, 2019: [Trial Reminder]
May, 2019
  • May 14, 2019: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 14, 2019: [Bail Hearing]
  • May 13, 2019: [Order on Motion for Bail]
  • May 09, 2019: [Bail]
April, 2019
  • April 25, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
March, 2019
  • March 01, 2019: [Stipulation]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: [Clerk's Notice - Filing Due]
  • February 15, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • February 12, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • February 12, 2019: [Order]
  • February 06, 2019: [Continue Trial]
December, 2018
  • December 14, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • December 11, 2018: [Order]
  • December 11, 2018: [Miscellaneous Filing]
  • December 07, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • December 07, 2018: [Order]
  • December 07, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 06, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 06, 2018: [Continue Trial]
November, 2018
  • November 16, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 15, 2018: [Trial Notice]
  • November 13, 2018: [Stipulation to Detention and/or Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • November 13, 2018: [Initial Appearance/Arraignment]
  • November 13, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • November 13, 2018: [Appoint Counsel]
  • November 07, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • November 07, 2018: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • November 07, 2018: [Hearing Notice]
  • November 02, 2018: [Warrant Issued]
  • November 02, 2018: [Praecipe for Warrant]
  • November 02, 2018: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.