U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00181-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Garcia-Tovar
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2019
  • April 12, 2019: [Judgment]
  • April 10, 2019: [Sentencing]
January, 2019
  • January 07, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
December, 2018
  • December 27, 2018: [Rescheduling Hearing Notice]
  • December 18, 2018: [Hearing Notice]
November, 2018
  • November 26, 2018: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • November 19, 2018: [Trial Notice]
  • November 19, 2018: [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
  • November 16, 2018: [Waiver of Presence at Arraignment]
  • November 02, 2018: [Warrant Issued]
  • November 02, 2018: [Praecipe for Warrant]
  • November 02, 2018: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.