U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00173-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rosa
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2020
  • January 30, 2020: [Collateral Return Acknowledgment]
September, 2019
  • September 19, 2019: [Order]
  • September 13, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • September 11, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • September 06, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
August, 2019
  • August 27, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • August 26, 2019: [Continue Trial]
  • August 26, 2019: [Juror Questionnaires]
May, 2019
  • May 28, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • May 16, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • May 15, 2019: [Continue Trial]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: [Attorney Withdrawal]
  • April 16, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
March, 2019
  • March 27, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • March 22, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • March 20, 2019: [Continue Trial]
January, 2019
  • January 03, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
December, 2018
  • December 20, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • December 18, 2018: [Continue Trial]
November, 2018
  • November 09, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 09, 2018: [Trial Notice]
  • November 07, 2018: [Collateral Receipt]
  • November 07, 2018: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 07, 2018: [Initial Appearance/Arraignment]
  • November 07, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • November 07, 2018: [Appoint Counsel]
  • November 06, 2018: [Hearing Notice]
  • November 06, 2018: [Case Unsealed]
  • November 06, 2018: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.