U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00172-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Teixeira
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • May 25, 2022: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
June, 2021
  • June 16, 2021: [Order on Probation 12BOrder]
September, 2020
  • September 16, 2020: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
July, 2020
  • July 27, 2020: [Addendum]
  • July 09, 2020: [Objection to Motion]
June, 2020
  • June 25, 2020: [Sealed Motion - Court Use]
  • June 25, 2020: [Compassionate Release]
  • June 08, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
May, 2020
  • May 04, 2020: [Response - to terminated motion]
April, 2020
  • April 27, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 15, 2020: [Objection to Motion]
  • April 13, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2019
  • November 21, 2019: [Receipt of Exhibits]
  • November 18, 2019: [Return of Exhibits]
August, 2019
  • August 14, 2019: [Judgment - Amended]
  • August 07, 2019: [Judgment]
  • August 07, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • August 07, 2019: [Acknowledgment of Sentencing Options]
  • August 02, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum]
July, 2019
  • July 29, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum]
April, 2019
  • April 08, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 08, 2019: [Detention Order]
  • April 05, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • April 05, 2019: [Bail Revocation Hearing]
  • April 04, 2019: [Warrant Issued]
  • April 03, 2019: [Petition on Probation/SR/Bail - Order - Warrant]
March, 2019
  • March 13, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment/Plea Hearing]
  • March 12, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • March 11, 2019: [Acknowledgment and Waiver of Rights]
  • March 05, 2019: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
January, 2019
  • January 17, 2019: [Substitute Attorney]
  • January 15, 2019: [Rescheduling Hearing Notice]
  • January 15, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • January 11, 2019: [Clerk's Notice - Filing Due]
December, 2018
  • December 20, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • December 19, 2018: [Continue Trial]
November, 2018
  • November 21, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • November 19, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • November 16, 2018: [Continue Trial]
  • November 13, 2018: [Trial Reminder]
  • November 07, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 07, 2018: [Trial Notice]
  • November 07, 2018: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 07, 2018: [Initial Appearance/Arraignment]
  • November 07, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • November 07, 2018: [Appoint Counsel]
  • November 06, 2018: [Hearing Notice]
  • November 06, 2018: [Case Unsealed]
  • November 06, 2018: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.